NV AB270 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing minority affairs. (BDR 18-130)
Title
Revises provisions governing minority affairs. (BDR 18-130)
Sponsors
Sen. Dina Neal [D] | Rep. Irene Bustamante Adams [D] | Rep. Lucy Flores [D] | Rep. Jason Frierson [D] |
Rep. William Horne [D] | Rep. Harvey Munford [D] | Sen. Kelvin Atkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | To committee. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | Exemption effective. |
2013-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 286.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |