NV AB27 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 54.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes regarding the licensure of educational personnel. (BDR 34-315)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes regarding the licensure of educational personnel. (BDR 34-315)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-13AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 54.
2015-05-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-06AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2015-05-05SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-05-04SenateRead second time.
2015-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-04-02SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2015-04-02SenateIn Senate.
2015-04-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2015-03-31AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-03-30AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 27.) To printer.
2015-03-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-02AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2014-12-22AssemblyFrom printer.
2014-12-20AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback