NV AB264 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 95.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 95.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; prohibiting a pupil in a public school from being deprived of any award that is based on perfect attendance or any eligibility or opportunity to compete for such an award because of an approved absence from school for the observance of a religious holiday; revising provisions governing the attendance of pupils and circumstances under which a pupil is deemed truant; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing attendance in public schools. (BDR 34-639)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 95. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 370.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |