NV AB261 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 478. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 478. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to governmental administration; requiring the State Plan for Economic Development to include a statement regarding the efficient use of water resources; requiring a plan submitted by certain regional development authorities to include water conservation strategies; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to water. (BDR 18-470)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Assembly | Chapter 478. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | To printer. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 845.) |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 479.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-07 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer. |