NV AB259 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-18 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to elections; revising the circumstances under which candidates of major political parties appear on or are omitted from the ballot at primary elections; revising provisions governing primary elections for candidates for nonpartisan offices; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 24-951)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-18 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 10, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 151.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |