NV AB259 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to certain criminal convictions and sentences. (BDR 14-657)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to certain criminal convictions and sentences. (BDR 14-657)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12AssemblyVetoed by the Governor.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblySenate Amendment No. 787 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-24AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.
2017-05-23SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-22SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 787.) To printer.
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-22SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 337.) To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-08AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-07AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback