NV AB256 | 2021 | 81st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 408.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to Medicaid; requiring the State Plan for Medicaid to provide coverage of doula services to the extent authorized by federal law; requiring the Department of Health and Human Services to apply for a waiver or State Plan amendment to receive federal funding for coverage of doula services; requiring any person who desires to provide doula services to a recipient of Medicaid to enroll with the Division of Health Care Financing and Policy of the Department; requiring an enrolled doula to report the abuse of certain persons; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for Medicaid coverage of doula services. (BDR 38-849)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-04AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 408.
2021-06-02AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2021-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2021-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2021-05-30SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2021-05-30SenatePlaced on General File.
2021-05-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-05-25SenateTo committee.
2021-05-25SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance.
2021-05-25SenateTaken from General File.
2021-05-25SenateRead second time.
2021-05-25SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2021-05-14SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2021-05-14SenateIn Senate.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate.
2021-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass, as amended.
2021-04-19AssemblyTo committee.
2021-04-19AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2021-04-16AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 208.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2021-04-16AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2021-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2021-03-18AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2021-03-15AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2021-03-12AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback