NV AB256 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to the Legislature; reducing the number of legislative measures that may be requested for a regular legislative session; moving certain provisions that authorize requests for legislative measures from the Joint Standing Rules to Nevada Revised Statutes; clarifying the manner in which legislative measures must be requested; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing legislative measures that may be requested for a regular legislative session. (BDR 17-83)
Sponsors
Sen. Robin Titus [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2019-04-12 | Assembly | Exempt pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6, subsection 4(a). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/80th2019/Bill/6461/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/80th2019/Bills/AB/AB256.pdf |