NV AB252 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 17-737)
Title
Revises provisions relating to elections. (BDR 17-737)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Waiver granted effective: May 21, 2015. |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2015-05-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 17, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-10 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-08 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-07 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 223.) To printer. |
2015-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-11 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer. |