NV AB25 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 503.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to certain allowable deductions from the period of probation or sentence of a person. (BDR 14-171)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to certain allowable deductions from the period of probation or sentence of a person. (BDR 14-171)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 503.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-06AssemblyTo enrollment.
2017-06-06AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-06AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-05AssemblyConference report adopted by Senate.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 954 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
2017-06-04AssemblyConference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateSenate Amendment No. 954 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
2017-06-03SenateIn Senate.
2017-06-03AssemblySenate Amendment No. 954 not concurred in. To Senate.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateTo printer.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.)
2017-05-26SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 954.)
2017-05-25SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-24SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-23SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-22SenateRead second time.
2017-05-22SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-03-10SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-03-10SenateIn Senate.
2017-03-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2017-03-08AssemblyRead second time.
2017-03-07AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2016-11-16AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback