NV AB249 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 553.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires the State Plan for Medicaid and all health insurance plans to provide certain benefits relating to contraception. (BDR 38-858)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires the State Plan for Medicaid and all health insurance plans to provide certain benefits relating to contraception. (BDR 38-858)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-12AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 553.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblyTo enrollment.
2017-06-05AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Fourth reprint .
2017-06-05AssemblyTo printer.
2017-06-05AssemblyConference report adopted by Senate.
2017-06-04AssemblyFrom committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 966 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.
2017-06-03AssemblyConference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.
2017-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateSenate Amendment No. 751 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-30AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-05-30AssemblySenate Amendment No. 966 concurred in.
2017-05-30AssemblySenate Amendment No. 751 not concurred in.
2017-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly.
2017-05-26SenateTo printer.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 18, Nays: 3.)
2017-05-26SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2017-05-26SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 966.)
2017-05-25SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-05-25SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-24SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 751.) To printer.
2017-05-24SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-24SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 429.) To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-03-02AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-03-01AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=536
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB249.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB249_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB249_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB249_R3.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB249_R4.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB249_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=414&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=249&fldBillname=AB249
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=1031&fldReprint=3&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=249&fldBillname=AB249

Bill Comments

feedback