NV AB241 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; requiring pupils enrolled in a public high school to be enrolled in the courses and credits required to obtain a college and career ready high school diploma or certain diplomas that are equivalent or more rigorous; establishing exceptions to the requirement for a pupil to be enrolled in such courses and credits; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the education of pupils enrolled in a public high school. (BDR 34-625)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 201. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 587 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 587.) To printer. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 368.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-06 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | To printer. |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. |