NV AB24 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the tuition charges assessed against certain students within the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-165)
Title
Revises provisions governing the tuition charges assessed against certain students within the Nevada System of Higher Education. (BDR 34-165)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 2. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-03-01 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2017-02-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |