NV AB236 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 633.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to crimes; revising provisions relating to the duties of the Nevada Sentencing Commission; establishing provisions relating to the calculation and use of the amount of certain costs avoided by this State; establishing the Nevada Local Justice Reinvestment Coordinating Council; revising the contents required in the report of any presentence investigation; requiring certain judges to receive training concerning reports of presentence investigations; making various changes concerning probation and parole; authorizing a court to defer or suspend judgment on a case in certain circumstances; revising provisions relating to specialty court programs; revising provisions relating to programs for the treatment of persons who commit domestic violence; reducing the penalty for certain crimes from a category B to a category C felony; revising provisions relating to burglary; increasing the felony theft threshold and revising penalties for various theft offenses; making it unlawful to install or affix a scanning device within or upon a machine used for financial transactions under certain circumstances; making it unlawful to access a scanning device under certain circumstances; revising provisions relating to habitual criminals; requiring the Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission to develop and implement a behavioral health field response grant program; revising provisions concerning crimes involving controlled substances; repealing provisions relating to programs of treatment for alcoholics and drug addicts and the civil commitment of such persons; making appropriations to the Division of Parole and Probation of the Department of Public Safety and the Department of Corrections; providing penalties; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes related to criminal law and criminal procedure. (BDR 14-564)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17AssemblyChapter 633.
2019-06-14AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-07AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblySenate Amendment Nos. 1107 and 1126 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-06-03AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-03SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint. To Assembly.
2019-06-03SenateTo printer.
2019-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.)
2019-06-03SenateReprinting dispensed with.
2019-06-03SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1126.)
2019-06-03SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
2019-06-02SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1107.) To printer.
2019-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-06-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-05-28SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-05-28SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-27AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 962.) To printer.
2019-05-27AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-27AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-05-23AssemblyTo committee.
2019-05-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 723.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 9, 2019.
2019-04-01AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-04AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-01AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback