NV AB236 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 155.
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 155.
Summary
Revises provisions governing grants of money for water conservation and capital improvements to certain water systems. (BDR 30-1049)
Title
Revises provisions governing grants of money for water conservation and capital improvements to certain water systems. (BDR 30-1049)
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Amodei [R] | Sen. Heidi Gansert [R] | Rep. Edwin Goedhart [R] | Sen. Pete Goicoechea [R] |
Rep. Tom Grady [R] | Sen. James Settelmeyer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 155. | |
2009-05-18 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-15 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-22 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-22 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 8, Excused: 1.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 537.) To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-05 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=481 |