NV AB232 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 124.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 124.
Summary
Revises provisions governing the Legislative Commission and the Interim Finance Committee. (BDR 17-810)
Title
Revises provisions governing the Legislative Commission and the Interim Finance Committee. (BDR 17-810)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-19 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 124. | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-13 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-11 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-05-08 | Read second time. | |
2009-05-06 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2009-04-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | |
2009-04-16 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-15 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2009-04-14 | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. | |
2009-04-14 | Placed on General File. | |
2009-04-14 | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. | |
2009-04-09 | Taken from General File. | |
2009-04-07 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-06 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 80.) To printer. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-03-05 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-03-04 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=473 |