NV AB23 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Division of Parole and Probation of the Department of Public Safety to establish and operate independent reporting facilities. (BDR 16-170)
Title
Authorizes the Division of Parole and Probation of the Department of Public Safety to establish and operate independent reporting facilities. (BDR 16-170)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 404. |
2017-06-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Corrections, Parole, and Probation. To printer. |