NV AB228 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Chapter 458.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Chapter 458.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Commission to Study Governmental Purchasing to conduct a study on contracts for public works. (BDR S-582)
Title
Directs the Commission to Study Governmental Purchasing to conduct a study on contracts for public works. (BDR S-582)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Chapter 458. | |
2011-06-16 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Amendment No. 890 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-05 | In Assembly. | |
2011-06-05 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-06-04 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 890.) To printer. | |
2011-06-04 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-06-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-27 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | |
2011-04-26 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-25 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. | |
2011-04-25 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-22 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 409.) To printer. | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-22 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-03-23 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-03-03 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-02 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |