NV AB223 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 379.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 379.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public welfare; requiring the Department of Health and Human Services to seek a federal waiver to provide certain dental care for persons with diabetes; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the Department of Health and Human Services to seek a federal waiver to provide certain dental care for persons with diabetes. (BDR 38-544)
Sponsors
Sen. Dina Neal [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 379. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | To printer. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Dispensed with reprinting. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 992.) |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 219.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |