NV AB217 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-02 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing off-highway vehicles. (BDR 43-994)
Title
Revises provisions governing off-highway vehicles. (BDR 43-994)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 425.) To printer. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-03-30 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |