NV AB217 | 2011 | 76th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-9)
Status: Passed on May 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-12 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals provisions governing the interstate sale of certain firearms. (BDR 52-596)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeals provisions governing the interstate sale of certain firearms. (BDR 52-596)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-12 Approved by the Governor. Chapter 38.
2011-05-09 Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
2011-05-06 In Assembly. To enrollment.
2011-05-02 Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2011-04-28 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-04-27 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-04-26 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-04-25 Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2011-04-22 Read second time.
2011-04-20 Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.
2011-04-19 From committee: Do pass.
2011-03-16 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2011-03-16 In Senate.
2011-03-14 Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2011-03-11 Read second time.
2011-03-10 From committee: Do pass.
2011-03-02 From printer. To committee.
2011-03-01 Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback