NV AB215 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the reporting of certain information relating to prescription drugs. (BDR 57-284)
Title
Requires the reporting of certain information relating to prescription drugs. (BDR 57-284)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2017-04-13 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: April 12, 2017. |
2017-03-10 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2017-03-10 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2017-03-07 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). |