NV AB214 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to the Nevada State Prison; making an appropriation to the Division of Museums and History of the Department of Tourism and Cultural Affairs to complete a feasibility study of the development of the historic structures, buildings and other property and any artifact resources of the Nevada State Prison for use as a historic, cultural, educational and scientific resource, including use as a museum; requiring the submission of a report of the results of the feasibility study to the Director of the Legislative Counsel Bureau for transmission to the 81st Session of the Nevada Legislature; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes an appropriation for a feasibility study of the development of the historic structures, buildings and other property and any artifact resources of the Nevada State Prison. (BDR S-535)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04Assembly(No further action taken.)
2019-04-16AssemblyTo committee.
2019-04-16AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-15AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 104.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-25AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback