NV AB21 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to local governing bodies; authorizing, under certain circumstances, a board of county commissioners in certain counties to appoint members of certain local governing bodies; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes a board of county commissioners in certain counties to appoint members of certain local governing boards under certain circumstances. (BDR 20-484)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 136. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2019-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2018-11-20 | Assembly | From printer. |
2018-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |