NV AB21 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-09 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 502.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-2)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-09AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 502.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-05AssemblySenate Amendment No. 946 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Absent: 1.) To Assembly.
2017-05-31SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-30SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 946.) To printer.
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-05-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-19SenateWaiver granted effective: May 19, 2017.
2017-04-26SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2017-04-26SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-24AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 557.) To printer.
2017-04-24AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-06AssemblyRead first time. To committee.
2016-11-21AssemblyFrom printer.
2016-11-16AssemblyPrefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback