NV AB201 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Chapter 129.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to traffic laws; providing that a person who drives a vehicle in certain trick driving displays is guilty of a gross misdemeanor; providing that a person who facilitates certain trick driving displays is guilty of a misdemeanor or a gross misdemeanor; defining trick driving display; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing certain traffic laws. (BDR 43-604)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24AssemblyChapter 129.
2019-05-23AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-05-22AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-15SenateTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 387.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-02-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback