NV AB199 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; authorizing a trade or professional association or labor union to collaborate with a school district or public school to offer certain training; establishing certain qualifications for a person who wishes to receive an endorsement to teach career and technical education; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to career and technical education. (BDR 34-954)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 122.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |