NV AB195 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 512. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 512. (Effective July 1, 2023)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to offenders; requiring the Department of Motor Vehicles to waive the fee for the administration of the examination required for the issuance of a noncommercial driver's license for certain persons released from prison; requiring the Department to waive any fee that would otherwise be imposed against a person for the late renewal of a driver's license if the late renewal resulted from the person being incarcerated; requiring the Department to reinstate free of charge a driver's license or to provide an original or renewal driver's license or an original or renewal identification card to certain persons released from prison in certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing certain fees for drivers' licenses and identification cards. (BDR 43-636)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Assembly | Chapter 512. (Effective July 1, 2023) |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-03 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 30.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-14 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To printer. |