NV AB192 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 400.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 400.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public health; revising provisions relating to the reporting of cases of syphilis; requiring, with certain exceptions, the testing of pregnant women for certain sexually transmitted infections; revising provisions concerning the testing and treatment of pregnant women for syphilis; restricting the amount that certain persons and facilities may require a third party insurer to pay for certain testing; revising penalties for failure to comply with provisions concerning testing of pregnant women for sexually transmitted infections; providing a civil penalty; requiring certain third party insurers to cover the testing of pregnant women for certain sexually transmitted infections; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing the testing of pregnant women for certain sexually transmitted infections. (BDR 40-453)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 400. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate. |
2021-05-14 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 505.) To printer. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | To committee. |
2021-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 63.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-05 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |