NV AB192 | 2009 | 75th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 237.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 237.
Summary
Revises provisions governing certain performance contracts for operating cost-savings measures. (BDR 27-245)
Title
Revises provisions governing certain performance contracts for operating cost-savings measures. (BDR 27-245)
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Aizley [D] | Rep. David Bobzien [D] | Rep. Marcus Conklin [D] | Sen. Moises Denis [D] |
Sen. Joseph Hardy [R] | Rep. Marilyn Kirkpatrick [D] | Rep. Ellen Koivisto [D] | Rep. Peggy Pierce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 237. | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Amendment No. 652 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-16 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. | |
2009-05-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 652.) To printer. | |
2009-05-12 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-04-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. | |
2009-04-21 | In Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | To Senate. | |
2009-04-21 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. | |
2009-04-20 | To printer. | |
2009-04-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) | |
2009-04-20 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2009-04-20 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2009-04-20 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 326.) | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2009-02-19 | From printer. To committee. | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/75th2009/Reports/history.cfm?ID=396 |