NV AB19 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the reporting requirements for certain information relating to veterans. (BDR 37-125)
Title
Revises the reporting requirements for certain information relating to veterans. (BDR 37-125)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 10. |
2017-04-28 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-02-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-02-27 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2017-02-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-21 | Assembly | From printer. |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |