NV AB183 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 573.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing the collection of a hospital bill. (BDR 40-694)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing the collection of a hospital bill. (BDR 40-694)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-04 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 573.
2017-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1107 concurred in. To enrollment.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
2017-06-04SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2017-06-03SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1107.) To printer.
2017-06-03SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
2017-06-02SenateTaken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2017-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-02SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-05-22SenateReferred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2017-05-22SenateAction of referral rescinded.
2017-05-22SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services.
2017-05-22SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-19AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate.
2017-05-19AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-05-18AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 685.) To printer.
2017-05-17AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-14AssemblyWaiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.
2017-02-15AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.
2017-02-13AssemblyPrefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback