NV AB182 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 262.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-02 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 262.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to crimes; revising the elements of the crime of advancing prostitution; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises the elements of the crime of advancing prostitution. (BDR 15-744)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 262. |
2021-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 588 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 588.) To printer. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.) To Senate. |
2021-04-09 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 87.) To printer. |
2021-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |