NV AB180 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 165.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 165.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Enacts the Juvenile Justice Bill of Rights. (BDR 5-711)
Title
Enacts the Juvenile Justice Bill of Rights. (BDR 5-711)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 165. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.) To Senate. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 229.) To printer. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). |