NV AB173 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Chapter 96.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Chapter 96.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to professional regulation; revising provisions relating to the exemption from licensure as a professional engineer for employees of certain public utility companies; revising provisions relating to eligibility to take certain required examinations for licensure as a professional land surveyor; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to professional engineers and land surveyors. (BDR 54-798)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Chapter 96. |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2021-05-21 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |