NV AB173 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 519.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises provisions governing private investigators. (BDR 54-758)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions governing private investigators. (BDR 54-758)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 519.
2015-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-05-31AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-05-28AssemblySenate Amendment No. 701 concurred in.
2015-05-22AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-21SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2015-05-21SenateDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2015-05-21SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-21SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 701.) To printer.
2015-05-20SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-04-21SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.
2015-04-21SenateIn Senate.
2015-04-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
2015-04-20AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2015-04-17AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 246.) To printer.
2015-04-16AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-02-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nevada State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/history.cfm?ID=391
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB173.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB173_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SJR/SJR17.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/SJR/SJR17_R1.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB173_R2.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Bills/AB/AB173_EN.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=470&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=173&fldBillname=AB173
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=470&fldReprint=1&fldDocTypeCode=SJR&fldBillNumber=17&fldBillname=SJR17
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/78th2015/Reports/BillVote.cfm?VoteID=992&fldReprint=2&fldDocTypeCode=AB&fldBillNumber=173&fldBillname=AB173

Bill Comments

feedback