NV AB172 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Failed on April 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to veterans; requiring the Nevada Veterans Services Commission to conduct a study concerning the effectiveness of the Department of Veterans Services; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Requires the Nevada Veterans Services Commission to conduct a study relating to the Department of Veterans Services. (BDR S-712)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2021-03-02 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-25 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/81st2021/Bill/7530/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/81st2021/Bills/AB/AB172.pdf |