NV AB171 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 483.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 483.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-812)
Title
Revises provisions governing charter schools. (BDR 34-812)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 483. | |
2011-06-13 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-05 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-05 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-04 | Read second time. | |
2011-06-04 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-06-04 | From committee: Do pass. | |
2011-06-02 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. | |
2011-06-02 | In Senate. | |
2011-05-31 | To Senate. | |
2011-05-31 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . | |
2011-05-30 | To printer. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) | |
2011-05-30 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2011-05-30 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 840.) | |
2011-05-30 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-29 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 787.) To printer. | |
2011-05-29 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-05-29 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-25 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-25 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2011-04-25 | Taken from General File. | |
2011-04-25 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-04-25 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-22 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 420.) To printer. | |
2011-04-22 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-22 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |