NV AB170 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 46.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revises the requirement for the Office of Economic Development to submit quarterly reports relating to certain economic development incentives. (BDR 32-302)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises the requirement for the Office of Economic Development to submit quarterly reports relating to certain economic development incentives. (BDR 32-302)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 46.
2017-05-18AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-05-17AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-05-16SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-05-15SenateRead second time.
2017-05-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-04-18SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.
2017-04-18SenateIn Senate.
2017-04-17AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 38, Nays: None, Excused: 4.) To Senate.
2017-04-14AssemblyTaken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.
2017-04-14AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
2017-04-13AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 164.) To printer.
2017-04-12AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.
2017-02-13AssemblyPrefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback