NV AB170 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 542.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing general obligations. (BDR 30-917)
Title
Revises provisions governing general obligations. (BDR 30-917)
Sponsors
Rep. Jill Dickman [R] | Rep. Jim Wheeler [R] | Rep. Michele Fiore [R] | Rep. John Ellison [R] |
Rep. John Hambrick [R] | Rep. John Moore [R] | Rep. Shelly Shelton [R] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 542. |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-05-31 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 762 concurred in. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2015-05-19 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 762.) To printer. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-04-17 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 269.) To printer. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2015-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |