NV AB170 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 182.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 182.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to warnings about the health hazards of smoking during pregnancy. (BDR 40-884)
Title
Establishes provisions relating to warnings about the health hazards of smoking during pregnancy. (BDR 40-884)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-31 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 182. | |
2011-05-27 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-05-25 | Senate Amendment No. 584 concurred in. To enrollment. | |
2011-05-23 | In Assembly. | |
2011-05-20 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 7.) To Assembly. | |
2011-05-20 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-05-19 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 584.) To printer. | |
2011-05-18 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-19 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. | |
2011-04-19 | In Senate. | |
2011-04-18 | To Senate. | |
2011-04-18 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 32, Nays: 10.) | |
2011-04-18 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-15 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 275.) To printer. | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-15 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-02-17 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |