NV AB167 | 2015 | 78th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 527.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes the storage and carrying of firearms and ammunition on the premises of a family foster home or by certain persons who reside in a family foster home under certain circumstances. (BDR 38-234)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the storage and carrying of firearms and ammunition on the premises of a family foster home or by certain persons who reside in a family foster home under certain circumstances. (BDR 38-234)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-10AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 527.
2015-06-08AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2015-06-02AssemblyTo enrollment.
2015-05-31AssemblySenate Amendment Nos. 786 and 1008 concurred in.
2015-05-30AssemblyIn Assembly.
2015-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 3, Excused: 2.) To Assembly.
2015-05-29SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
2015-05-29SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1008.) To printer.
2015-05-29SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2015-05-22SenateWaiver granted effective: May 22, 2015.
2015-05-22SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2015-05-22SenateTaken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
2015-05-19SenateFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Secretary's desk.
2015-05-19SenateTo printer.
2015-05-19SenateTaken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
2015-05-19SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 786.)
2015-05-19SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2015-05-19SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2015-03-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.
2015-03-24SenateIn Senate.
2015-03-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 15, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2015-03-20AssemblyRead second time.
2015-03-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass.
2015-02-18AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2015-02-17AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback