NV AB165 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 397.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 397.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to veterans; removing the 5-year limitation on assessing certain tuition charges against honorably discharged veterans; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing tuition for veterans. (BDR 34-681)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 397. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2021-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-05-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2021-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |