NV AB163 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 207.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-4)
Status: Passed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 207.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to employment; providing for hours of leave, under certain circumstances, if an employee or a family or household member of an employee is a victim of an act which constitutes sexual assault; prohibiting the Administrator of the Employment Security Division of the Department of Employment, Training and Rehabilitation from denying certain persons unemployment benefits under certain circumstances; requiring employers to provide reasonable accommodations under certain circumstances; prohibiting an employer from taking certain actions against an employee; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing employment. (BDR 53-834)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 207. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 538 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 538.) To printer. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-03-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-03-21 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-03-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |