NV AB161 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 422.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 422.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to common-interest communities; prohibiting common-interest communities from restricting the ownership of pets by a unit's owner under certain circumstances; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing common-interest communities. (BDR 10-705)
Sponsors
Rep. Shannon Bilbray-Axelrod [D] | Rep. Lesley Cohen [D] | Rep. Christopher Edwards [R] | Rep. Al Kramer [R] |
Rep. Heidi Swank [D] | Sen. Robin Titus [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 422. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 37, Nays: 3, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 375.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |