NV AB160 | 2021 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to offenders; requiring a court to provide credit for time spent in confinement before conviction to reduce a sentence of imprisonment; authorizing a court to provide credit for time spent in residential confinement before conviction to reduce a sentence of imprisonment; establishing limitations on credit for time spent in residential confinement before conviction for defendants who have been found guilty of a misdemeanor; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing credit awarded to reduce a sentence of imprisonment. (BDR 14-173)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-15 | Senate | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.) |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 193.) To printer. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |