NV AB159 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 31 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 144.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to offenders; adding certain offenses relating to cruelty to animals to the list of offenses for which credits earned by offenders may not be deducted from the minimum term or the minimum aggregate term imposed by a sentence; adding certain offenses relating to cruelty to animals to the list of offenses for which a court may not defer judgment; revising the maximum period for which a court may set or extend probation or suspension of a sentence for certain offenses; adding certain offenses relating to cruelty to animals to the list of offenses a person must not be convicted of to be eligible for a petition for early discharge; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to cruelty to animals. (BDR 16-71)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 144. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. |
2023-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |