NV AB159 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits hydraulic fracturing in this State. (BDR 46-593)
Title
Prohibits hydraulic fracturing in this State. (BDR 46-593)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Senate | (No further action taken.) |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 15, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass, as amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 179.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d). |