NV AB155 | 2015 | 78th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the issuance of special license plates for retired professional firefighters. (BDR 43-619)
Title
Revises provisions governing the issuance of special license plates for retired professional firefighters. (BDR 43-619)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 15. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. To enrollment. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Assembly. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read second time. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2015-03-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2015-03-03 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2015-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2015-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer. |