NV AB144 | 2017 | 79th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 594.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Nevada Advisory Commission on Mentoring. (BDR 34-31)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Nevada Advisory Commission on Mentoring. (BDR 34-31)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 594.
2017-06-05AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2017-06-04AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2017-06-03SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
2017-06-02SenateRead second time.
2017-06-02SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2017-06-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2017-05-31SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.
2017-05-31SenateIn Senate.
2017-05-31AssemblyTo Senate.
2017-05-31AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
2017-05-30AssemblyTo printer.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.)
2017-05-30AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2017-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1000.)
2017-05-30AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2017-05-30AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-04-20AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
2017-04-19AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 555.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2017-04-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2017-03-21AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2017-02-14AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2017-02-13AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.
2017-02-13AssemblyPrefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback